02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/28/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Held under submission. | |||
05/27/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/26/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/21/2009 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18). | |||
05/05/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/20/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
03/04/2009 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/06/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. | |||
02/05/2009 | Read first time. To print. |