05/04/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/28/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/27/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |||
04/13/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
04/12/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |