|
06/29/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 5. Page 5241.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5188.).
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|