|
06/28/2010
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 30. Page 5522.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|