|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 6836.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 26).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4800.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1632.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 13).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|