|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6463.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 6531.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4708.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 5427.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|