California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2342 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2010

Amended

Bill August 17, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill May 28, 2010
Bill April 15, 2010