LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2345
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2345
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2345
Compare Versions
AB2345 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB2345 Enrolled September 2, 2010
AB2345 Amended August 18, 2010
AB2345 Amended August 17, 2010
AB2345 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2345 Amended June 16, 2010
AB2345 Amended April 22, 2010
AB2345 Amended April 8, 2010
AB2345 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2345 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB2345 Enrolled September 2, 2010
AB2345 Amended August 18, 2010
AB2345 Amended August 17, 2010
AB2345 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2345 Amended June 16, 2010
AB2345 Amended April 22, 2010
AB2345 Amended April 8, 2010
AB2345 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare