|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6562.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6584.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4796.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5423.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5338.).
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|