|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 4856.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|