|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 598, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 4707.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 5036.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|