|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 5559.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|