|
08/31/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Hancock.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 4312.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hancock. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4312.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 5. Page 5037.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|