|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6725.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6557.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4412.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5459.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. by unanimous consent. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4674.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|