06/30/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |||
06/16/2010 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
05/06/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/22/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 31. Page 4818.) | |||
04/15/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 14). | |||
04/08/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 7). | |||
03/24/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/23/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |