|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 678, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:20 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6585.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4771.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4820.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 24).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|