|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 385, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6159.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4413.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5087.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|