06/24/2010 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration refused. | |||
06/10/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
06/01/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/01/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 5426.) | |||
05/12/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/11/2010 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
05/10/2010 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 5). | |||
04/13/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/12/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/07/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |