|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 693, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4826.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 30. Page 5424.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|