|
07/01/2010
|
From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Corrected August 20.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5160.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|