|
09/28/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 424, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 6977.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 5088.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 5111.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 5523.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|