|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 386, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4974.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4943.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|