|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 316, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2653.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1665.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 976.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 18).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|