California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2398 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill August 27, 2010
Bill August 20, 2010
Bill August 17, 2010
Bill June 23, 2010
Bill May 28, 2010
Bill April 14, 2010