BILL NUMBER: AB 24AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 23, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 26, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Block (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Salas) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ma and Saldana) DECEMBER 1, 2008 An act to amend Section 89320 of, and to add Section 89013 to , the Education Code, relating to the California State University. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 24, as amended, Block. California State University: feasibility study: Chula Vista: student religious creed. Vista. (1) Existing Existing law establishes the various segments of the public higher education system in the state. These segments include the University of California, which is administered by the Regents of the University of California, the California State University, which is administered by the Trustees of the California State University, and the California Community Colleges, which is administered by the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges. This bill would require the Chancellor of the California State University , by July 1, 2011, to complete and submit to the trustees a study about the feasibility of a California State University satellite program, and ultimately, an independent California State University campus, at Chula Vista , within 18 months after the date that the trustees certify that sufficient funds are available to conduct the study. The bill would require funding for the study to be derived solely from nonstate sources . If the trustees decide that a new campus or off-campus center is needed at Chula Vista, the trustees would be required to submit a formal needs study to the California Postsecondary Education Commission. (2) Existing law requires the Trustees of the California State University to require each state university to permit a student to take a test at a time when it would not violate the student's religious creed. Existing law provides that this requirement does not apply if providing an alternative time to take the test would create an undue hardship. This bill would redefine the undue hardship exception to specify the circumstances that constitute an undue hardship is. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 89013 is added to the Education Code, to read: 89013. (a) The Chancellor of the California State University shall conduct a study about the feasibility of a California State University satellite program, and ultimately, an independent California State University campus, at Chula Vista. The study shall include all of the following: (1) Ten-year enrollment projections and physical capacity analysis. (2) Regional workforce needs. (3) Prospective economic impact and job creation in the region. (4) Infrastructure availability. (5) The potential alleviation of overcrowding and traffic at the San Diego State University campus. (6) Considerations of plausible alternatives. (7) Academic planning and program justification. (8) A description of proposed student services and student outreach programs. (9) Support and capital outlay budget projections. (10) Geographic and physical accessibility. (11) Environmental and social impacts. (12) Effects on other educational institutions. (b) The chancellor shall complete and submit the study to the trustees by July 1, 2011. (b) Funding for the study required by subdivision (a) shall be derived solely from nonstate sources. The chancellor shall complete and submit the study to the trustees within 18 months after the date that the trustees certify that sufficient funds are available to conduct the study. (c) If the trustees determine there is a need for a new campus or off-campus center at Chula Vista, the trustees shall submit a formal needs study to the California Postsecondary Education Commission pursuant to Section 66904. SEC. 2. Section 89320 of the Education Code is amended to read: 89320. (a) The Trustees of the California State University shall require each state university, in administering any test or examination, to permit any student who is eligible to undergo the test or examination to do so, without penalty, at a time when that activity would not violate the student's religious creed. (b) Subdivision (a) does not apply if the trustees or their designee determine that administering the test or examination at an alternate time would impose an undue hardship. Either of the following circumstances constitute an undue hardship: (1) Expense in administering the test at a different time that creates a substantial financial burden for the institution. (2) Substantial disruption to the educational mission of the institution caused by administering the test at a different time. ____ CORRECTIONS Text--Page 3. ____