LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB24
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB24
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB24
Compare Versions
AB24 Enrolled September 11, 2009
AB24 Amended September 1, 2009
AB24 Amended July 23, 2009
AB24 Amended July 1, 2009
AB24 Amended June 1, 2009
AB24 Amended February 26, 2009
AB24 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
AB24 Enrolled September 11, 2009
AB24 Amended September 1, 2009
AB24 Amended July 23, 2009
AB24 Amended July 1, 2009
AB24 Amended June 1, 2009
AB24 Amended February 26, 2009
AB24 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare