|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3351.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2341.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 821.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|