California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2010

Amended

Bill June 17, 2010
Bill May 28, 2010