|
07/06/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 42, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5735.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3946.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4819.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|