|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6160.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4413.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4851.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|