|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 468, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6146.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6146.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4460.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5027.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4712.)
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|