04/05/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/25/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |||
03/24/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/18/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and NAT. RES. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |