|
08/13/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5999.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 4198.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5163.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|