LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB243
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB243
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB243
Compare Versions
AB243 Enrolled September 11, 2009
AB243 Amended August 27, 2009
AB243 Amended July 16, 2009
AB243 Amended June 22, 2009
AB243 Amended May 26, 2009
AB243 Amended April 13, 2009
AB243 Introduced February 10, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB243 Enrolled September 11, 2009
AB243 Amended August 27, 2009
AB243 Amended July 16, 2009
AB243 Amended June 22, 2009
AB243 Amended May 26, 2009
AB243 Amended April 13, 2009
AB243 Introduced February 10, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare