06/03/2010 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Chesbro. | |||
05/10/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 5). | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |