|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 67. Noes 10. Page 6925.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4844.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5502.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|