|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 6447.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4484.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 5200.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|