05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/12/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/04/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/29/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/28/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/27/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 20). | |||
04/12/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
04/08/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |