07/19/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 124, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/19/2010 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/07/2010 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |||
07/01/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
07/01/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4200.) | |||
06/24/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/23/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 22). | |||
04/29/2010 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
04/08/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/08/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4551.) | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (March 23). | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |