|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 226, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3343.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice waived. (Page 3202.) From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 9).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice waived. (Page 2823.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1969.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1239.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|