|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 388, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6421.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4591.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4860.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|