|
09/23/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 6. Page 4462.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 15).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 7. Page 4856.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|