|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1520.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1239.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|