|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 658, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 6909.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Ordered to third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 5004.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4960.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading. (Corrected August 24.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Corrected June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 5486.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|