|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 684, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4589.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5131.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|