04/20/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/13/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |||
04/12/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/05/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |||
03/25/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and L. GOV. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |