05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/12/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/20/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |||
04/14/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. | |||
04/13/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. (Corrected April 16.) | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |