06/10/2010 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
06/01/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/01/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 5412.) | |||
05/28/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/21/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/07/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |