|
08/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4979.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 5560.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5388.).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|