California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB248 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill July 8, 2009
Bill June 24, 2009
Bill May 13, 2009